This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/20/2019 at 19:10:28 (UTC).

GIDNEY, YOHKO K V CORY B SIX DBA PINCH-A-PENNY STORE #64

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 GIDNEY, YOHKO K filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CORY B SIX DBA PINCH-A-PENNY STORE 64. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GIDNEY , YOHKO K

Defendant and Respondent

CORY B SIX DBA PINCH-A-PENNY STORE #64

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESETTING

11/07/2019:ORDER RESETTING

RESPONSE TO: OPPOSE THE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE. FB PLT

11/06/2019:RESPONSE TO: OPPOSE THE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE. FB PLT

PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3406377

11/06/2019:PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3406377

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

10/31/2019:MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

PAID $2.30 ON RECEIPT 3397450

10/31/2019:PAID $2.30 ON RECEIPT 3397450

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/24/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

ISSUED/NOT PROCESSED

10/16/2019:ISSUED/NOT PROCESSED

INFORMATION SHEET SUMMONS INFORMATION SHEET FOR DFT. FB PLT

10/16/2019:INFORMATION SHEET SUMMONS INFORMATION SHEET FOR DFT. FB PLT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PAID $186.90 ON RECEIPT 3370395

10/16/2019:PAID $186.90 ON RECEIPT 3370395

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • Cancelled SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se on 12/3/2019 9:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RESETTING; Notes:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 12/17/2019 AT 9:30 A.M. - SIGNED JUDGE CASTOR 11/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO: OPPOSE THE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE. FB PLT; Notes:OPPOSE THE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE. FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3406377; Notes:$0.30 3406377 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL; Notes:REQUEST FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $2.30 ON RECEIPT 3397450; Notes:$2.30 3397450 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10.21.19 FOR DFT CORY B SIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:TO DFT ORIG FWD TO PBSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ISSUED/NOT PROCESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INFORMATION SHEET SUMMONS INFORMATION SHEET FOR DFT. FB PLT; Notes:SUMMONS INFORMATION SHEET FOR DFT. FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • Receipt Number:3406377; Receipt Amount: $0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Receipt Number:3397450; Receipt Amount: $2.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Receipt Number:3370395; Receipt Amount: $186.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$189.50; total Amount Paid:$189.50; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Due Date:11/06/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$0.30; Amount Paid:$0.30; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Due Date:10/31/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$2.30; Amount Paid:$2.30; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$1.90; Amount Paid:$1.90; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:Summons $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • CANCELLED - SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se; Location:NB; Room:#1 (North Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less