This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 19:06:01 (UTC).

GENERAL PERSHING LLC V SPOONER, HAROLD

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 GENERAL PERSHING LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SPOONER, HAROLD. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GENERAL PERSHING LLC

Defendant and Respondent

SPOONER , HAROLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

02/24/2023:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

02/23/2023:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

02/23/2023:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

02/23/2023:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

02/23/2023:RETURNED MAIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/22/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/15/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY **JUDGE JAMES SHERMAN 02/15/2023**

02/15/2023:ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY **JUDGE JAMES SHERMAN 02/15/2023**

EMERGENCY MOTION

02/15/2023:EMERGENCY MOTION

ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY. SIGN BY JUDGE SHERMAN 2/14/23

02/14/2023:ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY. SIGN BY JUDGE SHERMAN 2/14/23

PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 4778497

02/14/2023:PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 4778497

EMERGENCY MOTION

02/14/2023:EMERGENCY MOTION

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34118 PAGE 641-641

02/09/2023:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34118 PAGE 641-641

ORDER OF DEFAULT

02/09/2023:ORDER OF DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/09/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION TO STRIKE

02/08/2023:MOTION TO STRIKE

RESPONSE TO: FB PLT- TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS MOOT

02/08/2023:RESPONSE TO: FB PLT- TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS MOOT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/08/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes: HAROLD SPOONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes: TO HAROLD SPOONER - STAMPED CLERK TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes: TO HAROLD SPOONER - STAMPED CLERK TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes: TO HARDOLD SPOONER - STAMPED CLERK TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes: TO HAROLD SPOONER - STAMPED CLERK TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: HAROLD SPOONER SERVED 2/16/23 13:50PM EXECUTED 2/21/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FWD TO PBSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY **JUDGE JAMES SHERMAN 02/15/2023**; Notes: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY **JUDGE JAMES SHERMAN 02/15/2023**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION; Notes: TO STAY - F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4778497; Receipt Amount: $0.30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $0.45 ON RECEIPT 4765777; Notes: $0.45 4765777 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4764346; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4764346; Notes: $195.00 4764346 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less