Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 06/07/2021 at 21:15:27 (UTC).

GANNON, ANNE M V WYCLIFFE DENTAL CENTER INC

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 GANNON, ANNE M filed an Other lawsuit against WYCLIFFE DENTAL CENTER INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROWE , CYMONIE and CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROWE , CYMONIE

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

JOHNSONS MEMORIAL CHAPEL

UPS STORE

MAXS HARVEST

DORRIANS WEST PALM

RELISH & MORE

PET PB

POREES MOBIL & FOOD STORE

ATLANTIC CLINICAL RESEARCH

LASER LIGHT LLC

RANCHO CHICO

CLEARENT

A 1 AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR

TOPSHOT USA

FITRX

SEASTONE OF DELRAY

BADGLEY LANDSCAPE & MAINTENANCE CO

POSITIVE BEHAVIOR SUPPORT

HYPOLUXO CHEVRON

GODDARD SCHOOL THE

CASA DEL MONTE MHP LLC

1,520 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MAYOR , ORFELIA M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE FROM THE CLERK OF COURT

06/21/2019:NOTICE FROM THE CLERK OF COURT

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/20/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

PETITION

06/13/2019:PETITION

RETURNED MAIL

08/13/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

08/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/24/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/15/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/15/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/12/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/12/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/08/2019:RETURNED MAIL

MOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS F/B PET

06/13/2019:MOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS F/B PET

298 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER LIFTING STAY BANKRUPTCY; Notes:CURLEY; THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE DTD 2/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER C ROWE DTD 2/24/20 REQUIRING PLTF TO SUBMIT WRITTEN STATUS REPORT BY 3/27/20; Notes:C ROWE DTD 2/24/20 REQUIRING PLTF TO SUBMIT WRITTEN STATUS REPORT BY 3/27/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST; Notes:ALL EXHIBITS TURNED INTO EVIDENCE DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ROWE DTD 10/7/19: RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBIT A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON JUNE 13, 2019 WHO HAVE EITHER PAID THEIR TAXED OR HAVE BEEN DELETED FROM THE TAX ROLL AS A RESULT OF A CERTIFICATE OF CORRECTION ISSUED BY THE PROPERTY APPRAISER DISMISSED BOOK 30978 PAGE 1708-1766; Notes:ROWE DTD 10/7/19: RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBIT A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON JUNE 13, 2019 WHO HAVE EITHER PAID THEIR TAXED OR HAVE BEEN DELETED FROM THE TAX ROLL AS A RESULT OF A CERTIFICATE OF CORRECTION ISSUED BY THE PROPERTY APPRAISER DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; Notes:F/B ATTY MAYOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Notes:TO THE SPOT'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS (F/B PETITIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - F/B PETITIONER; Notes:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - F/B PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - F/B PETITIONER; Notes:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - F/B PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:CORAL REEF CROSSFIT

    Read MoreRead Less
298 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING 08/19/2019 09:15:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE (UNISSUED) FROM THE CLERK OF COURT; Notes:(UNISSUED) FROM THE CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS F/B PET; Notes:TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS F/B ANNE M GANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3169434; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:05/16/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT; Notes:TO FILE ACTION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3169434; Notes:$401.00 3169434 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LASER LIGHT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEARENT LLC is a litigant