Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 05/05/2021 at 21:36:24 (UTC).

GANNON, ANNE M V SADDLEBROOK APARTMENTS

Case Summary

On 05/13/2016 GANNON, ANNE M filed an Other lawsuit against SADDLEBROOK APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SASSER , MEENU. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SASSER , MEENU

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

GET IN SHAPE FOR WOMEN

JO ANN FRANCIS MEDICAL ESTHETICS

ATLANTIC GAMES

SANCHEZ ALEXANDRO

GENESIS CABINETRY & STONEWORKS

J LUXTON DESIGN LLC

MAXS HARVEST

MYKASSA APPLIANCES LLC

DIAMOND BEAUTY SCHOOL

LA GRANJA LANTANA LLC

UNITED SITE SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC

SEYMOURS TAX & NOTARY SERVICES

ASIA

PARTNERSHIP REALTY GROUP LLC

BOAT MD THE

KEMCO PERFORMANCE TIRE & WHEEL

CAFE MARTIER

X-QUISITE COLLISION CENTER

SOUTHCOAST PLUMBING CONTRACTORS

ST TROPEZ

2,326 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MAYOR , ORFELIA M

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

10/11/2016:RETURNED MAIL

AFFIDAVIT

10/05/2016:AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

09/30/2016:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

RESPONSE TO: SEASCAPE WEALTH MANAGEMENT'S ANSWER TO THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS F\B ANNE M. GANNON

09/07/2016:RESPONSE TO: SEASCAPE WEALTH MANAGEMENT'S ANSWER TO THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS F\B ANNE M. GANNON

ORDER LIMITING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS. ALL PARTIES RESPONDING TO THE PETITION OF PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR NEED ONLY SERVE THE ATTORNEY FOR THE TAX COLLECTOR AS DESIGNATED IN THE PLEADING. PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR NEED ONLY TO SERVE EACH INDIVIDUAL RESPONDENT RELATIVE TO THEIR RESPECTIVE DELINQUENT TAX AND/OR TAX WARRANT AS INDENTIFIED IN THE TAX COLLECTORS PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS M SASSER DTD 9/02/16

09/02/2016:ORDER LIMITING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS. ALL PARTIES RESPONDING TO THE PETITION OF PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR NEED ONLY SERVE THE ATTORNEY FOR THE TAX COLLECTOR AS DESIGNATED IN THE PLEADING. PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR NEED ONLY TO SERVE EACH INDIVIDUAL RESPONDENT RELATIVE TO THEIR RESPECTIVE DELINQUENT TAX AND/OR TAX WARRANT AS INDENTIFIED IN THE TAX COLLECTORS PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS M SASSER DTD 9/02/16

RETURNED MAIL

09/02/2016:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/02/2016:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/27/2016:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/25/2016:RETURNED MAIL

LETTER

07/18/2016:LETTER

LETTER

07/11/2016:LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE

07/11/2016:CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE NOTICE FROM THE CLERK COURT HRG SET 8/19/16 AT 9:30 AM RM 9D AND FINAL HRG 9/30/16 AT 9:30 AM RM 9D

06/17/2016:NOTICE NOTICE FROM THE CLERK COURT HRG SET 8/19/16 AT 9:30 AM RM 9D AND FINAL HRG 9/30/16 AT 9:30 AM RM 9D

ORDER SETTING HEARING

06/15/2016:ORDER SETTING HEARING

PETITION

06/08/2016:PETITION

MOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS- F/B PET

06/08/2016:MOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS- F/B PET

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 1661548

05/13/2016:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 1661548

NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE ACTION

05/13/2016:NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE ACTION

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:AMERICAN MARINE TECH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 28637 PAGE 708-791; Notes:ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBIT A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS WHO HAVE EITHER PAID THEIR TAXES OR HAVE BEEN DELETED FROM THE TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. DTD 9/30/16 M SASSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:PETITION W/EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:OF EXHIBIT A OF WARRANT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:OF EXHIBIT 2 PALM BEACH DAILY BUSINESS REVIEW NEWSPAPER ( MAY 4,2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:EXHIBIT 1 OF CONSTITUTIONAL TAX COLLECTOR OF PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:FILED BY ORFELIA M MAYOR ATTORNEY'S FEE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; Notes:F\B ANNE E GANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:(SPECIALLY SET) 9/30/16 AT 9:30AM IN COURTROOM 9D RE: PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS DTD 6/15/16 MEENU SASSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:(SPECIALLY SET) 8/19/16 AT 9:30AM IN COURTROOM 9D. DTD 6/15/16 MEENU SASSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRENTS FILED BY ANNE GANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS- F/B PET; Notes:TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS- F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • FinancialReceipt Number:1661548; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • FinancialDue Date:05/13/2016; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 1661548; Notes:$401.00 1661548 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE ACTION; Notes:NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Asia is a litigant

Latest cases where The Boat Company is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED SITE SERVICES OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYOR , ORFELIA M