Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/28/2021 at 10:32:36 (UTC).

GANNON, ANNE M V ADVANCED PRECISION MACHINING

Case Summary

On 05/14/2018 GANNON, ANNE M filed an Other lawsuit against ADVANCED PRECISION MACHINING. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

RELIANCE TREATMENT CENTERS LLC

JOHNSONS MEMORIAL CHAPEL

AQUAULTHERAPY LLC

RHEMI

MAXS HARVEST

BEVE UPSCALE URBAN BEAUTY

DIAMOND BEAUTY SCHOOL

ACADEMY ADOLESCENT TREATMENT CENTER THE

JP PETS LLC

LASER LIGHT LLC

RIALTO CLUBHOUSE

PD PAINTING

FITRX

BADGLEY LANDSCAPE & MAINTENANCE CO

LED SOURCE LLC

HYPOLUXO CHEVRON

EXXON

CASA DEL MONTE MHP LLC

THOMPSON MICHAEL J OR JULIA S

NAVARRO DERMATOLOGY SKIN & VEIN CARE

1,584 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MAYOR , ORFELIA M

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT LIST

10/26/2018:EXHIBIT LIST

ORDER C ROWE: AMENDED ORDER ON PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT (AMENDED TO INCLUDE EXHIBIT "A" AS AN ATTACHMENT) ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON 6/12/17 WHO HAVE EITHER PD OR DELETED FM TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION DTD 09/21/18 BOOK 30144 PAGE 266-323

09/21/2018:ORDER C ROWE: AMENDED ORDER ON PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT (AMENDED TO INCLUDE EXHIBIT "A" AS AN ATTACHMENT) ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON 6/12/17 WHO HAVE EITHER PD OR DELETED FM TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION DTD 09/21/18 BOOK 30144 PAGE 266-323

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

09/18/2018:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER - ROWE - ON PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT - ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON 6/12/17 WHO HAVE EITHER PD OR DELETED FM TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION, DTD 9/15/18 (EHIBIT A NOT ATTACHED) BOOK 30134 PAGE 443-446

09/17/2018:ORDER - ROWE - ON PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT - ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON 6/12/17 WHO HAVE EITHER PD OR DELETED FM TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION, DTD 9/15/18 (EHIBIT A NOT ATTACHED) BOOK 30134 PAGE 443-446

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

09/10/2018:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

MOTION FOR POSTPONE HEARING ON 9/14/2018

09/06/2018:MOTION FOR POSTPONE HEARING ON 9/14/2018

ORDER ROWE - LIMITING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS - PARTIES RESPONDING TO PETITION OF PB CTY TAX COLLECTOR NEED ONLY SERVE ATTY FOR TAX COLLECTOR. DTD 8/24/18

08/24/2018:ORDER ROWE - LIMITING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS - PARTIES RESPONDING TO PETITION OF PB CTY TAX COLLECTOR NEED ONLY SERVE ATTY FOR TAX COLLECTOR. DTD 8/24/18

MOTION COURT DISMISSAL

08/22/2018:MOTION COURT DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

08/21/2018:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

07/26/2018:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

NOTICE FROM THE CLERK OF COURT

06/20/2018:NOTICE FROM THE CLERK OF COURT

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/14/2018:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/14/2018:NOTICE OF HEARING

PETITION

06/12/2018:PETITION

MOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS F/B PLT

06/12/2018:MOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS F/B PLT

NOTICE OF INTENT

05/14/2018:NOTICE OF INTENT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/14/2018:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2671218

05/14/2018:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2671218

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Notes:F/B PLT ***NO WRIT ISSUED ON CASE***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST; Notes:EXHIBITS TURNED INTO EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER C ROWE: AMENDED ORDER ON PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT (AMENDED TO INCLUDE EXHIBIT "A" AS AN ATTACHMENT) ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON 6/12/17 WHO HAVE EITHER PD OR DELETED FM TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION DTD 09/21/18 BOOK 30144 PAGE 266-323; Notes:C ROWE: AMENDED ORDER ON PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT (AMENDED TO INCLUDE EXHIBIT "A" AS AN ATTACHMENT) ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON 6/12/17 WHO HAVE EITHER PD OR DELETED FM TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION DTD 09/21/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ROWE - ON PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT - ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON 6/12/17 WHO HAVE EITHER PD OR DELETED FM TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION, DTD 9/15/18 (EHIBIT A NOT ATTACHED) BOOK 30134 PAGE 443-446; Notes:- ROWE - ON PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT - ALL RESPONDENTS LISTED ON EXHIBITS A OF THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS FILED ON 6/12/17 WHO HAVE EITHER PD OR DELETED FM TAX ROLL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION, DTD 9/15/18 (EHIBIT A NOT ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes:SAVEENE FROM THE PETITION FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS (F/B PETITIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR POSTPONE HEARING ON 9/14/2018; Notes:FOR POSTPONE HEARING ON 9/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ROWE - LIMITING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS - PARTIES RESPONDING TO PETITION OF PB CTY TAX COLLECTOR NEED ONLY SERVE ATTY FOR TAX COLLECTOR. DTD 8/24/18; Notes:ROWE - LIMITING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS - PARTIES RESPONDING TO PETITION OF PB CTY TAX COLLECTOR NEED ONLY SERVE ATTY FOR TAX COLLECTOR. DTD 8/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION COURT DISMISSAL; Notes:COURT DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS F/B PLT; Notes:TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • FinancialReceipt Number:2671218; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$2,503.50; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$2,102.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • FinancialDue Date:05/14/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • FinancialDue Date:07/30/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$2,102.50; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$2,102.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT; Notes:TO FILE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2671218; Notes:$401.00 2671218 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LED SOURCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LASER LIGHT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PDI Coatings Inc is a litigant