This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/04/2021 at 15:37:24 (UTC).

GANDEL, BARBARA R V COOPERSMITH, ANITA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 GANDEL, BARBARA R filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COOPERSMITH, ANITA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GANDEL , BARBARA R

Respondents and Defendants

COOPERSMITH , ANITA

BOCA WOODS COUNTRY CLUB ASSOCIATION INC

BOCA WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

LESLIE COOPERSMITH GREENBERG IN HER CAPACITY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ANITA COOPERSMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

TISON , DEVIN P

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

TUTTLE ESQ, JODY

CONCEPCION , HECTER

 

Court Documents

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3893291

02/01/2021:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3893291

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

AGREED ORDER GKEYSER DTD 1/28/21 GRANTING PLTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT -GRANTED

01/28/2021:AGREED ORDER GKEYSER DTD 1/28/21 GRANTING PLTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT -GRANTED

MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

01/25/2021:MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/20/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/20/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/20/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/07/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3858419

12/30/2020:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3858419

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER G CURLEY DTD. 12/23/20 MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD/SUBSTITUTE DEFT ANITA COOPERSMITH

12/23/2020:ORDER G CURLEY DTD. 12/23/20 MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD/SUBSTITUTE DEFT ANITA COOPERSMITH

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/21/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/11/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/10/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/10/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

12/09/2020:MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE

12/09/2020:ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

06/11/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3893291; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$441.00; total Amount Paid:$441.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/01/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3893291; Notes:$10.00 3893291 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT BOCA WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER GKEYSER DTD 1/28/21 GRANTING PLTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT -GRANTED; Notes:GKEYSER DTD 1/28/21 GRANTING PLTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT -GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B JODY A. TUTTLE ESQ.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:THE MONSONLAW FIRM NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR THE DFT (F/B JODY A. TUTTLE ESQ)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (F/B DFT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:03/18/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:03/18/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT BOCA WOODS COUNTRY CLUB ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT ANITA COOPERSMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3587075; Notes:$421.00 3587075 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AA: Circuit Civil Central - AA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED WRONG CLERK OF COURT LISTED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com WRONG CLERK OF COURT LISTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED WRONG CLERK OF COURT LISTED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com WRONG CLERK OF COURT LISTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOCA WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tison, Devin P