This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/12/2023 at 01:19:00 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC V PEARSON, SYLVESTER

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEARSON, SYLVESTER. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

PEARSON , SYLVESTER

Greenacres, FL 33415-8960

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/01/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

12/01/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4700924

12/05/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4700924

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6K (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4700924; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LAWFIRMFL@RAUSCHSTURM.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 1/10/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 1/10/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4700924; Notes: $310.00 4700924 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/02/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/02/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW