This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 11/08/2022 at 01:16:35 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC V LEWIS, JASMINE

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LEWIS, JASMINE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

LEWIS , JASMINE

West Palm Beach, FL 33409-7774

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ESCOBEDO , PABLO J

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SMITH , BRIAN W

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/28/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

09/28/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4630646

09/30/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4630646

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/28/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/28/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

11/03/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/04/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4671919

11/07/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4671919

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/04/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

11/04/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/04/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF DISPUTE, NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY'S FEES AND NOTICE OF TRIAL BY JURY F/B DFT

11/04/2022:NOTICE OF DISPUTE, NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY'S FEES AND NOTICE OF TRIAL BY JURY F/B DFT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6M (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4671919; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $320.00; total Amount Paid: $320.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/07/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LAWFIRMFL@RAUSCHSTURM.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 12/8/2022 9:30 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 12/8/2022 9:30 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4671919; Notes: $10.00 4671919 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISPUTE, NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY'S FEES AND NOTICE OF TRIAL BY JURY F/B DFT; Notes: OF DISPUTE, NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY'S FEES AND NOTICE OF TRIAL BY JURY F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B BRIAN W SMITH OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4630646; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/30/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/30/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LAWFIRMFL@RAUSCHSTURM.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 11/3/2022 9:00 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 11/3/2022 9:00 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4630646; Notes: $310.00 4630646 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PABLO J. ESCOBEDO