This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/10/2022 at 15:09:25 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC V GUNTER, ERROL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GUNTER, ERROL. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

GUNTER , ERROL

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/11/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

08/11/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4572095

08/12/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4572095

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/19/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/01/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER SETTING HEARING

09/06/2022:ORDER SETTING HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: 11/7/22 @11:30AM VIA ZOOM JUDGE GARRISON ON 9/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ERROL GUNTER - 08/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4572095; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/12/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4572095; Notes: $310.00 4572095 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: lawfirmFL@rsieh.com;jfagen@rsieh.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW