This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 15:59:00 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC V ALBARO, MIRANDA

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALBARO, MIRANDA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

ALBARO , MIRANDA

West Palm Beach, FL 33415-4696

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/11/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

08/11/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4572669

08/12/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4572669

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/19/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

09/16/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT ATTY PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE MIRANDA ALBARO - 08/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4572669; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/12/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LAWFIRMFL@RSIEH.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 9/15/2022 1:30 PM BURKE, LAUREN; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 9/15/2022 1:30 PM BURKE, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4572669; Notes: $185.00 4572669 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW