This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/01/2022 at 09:07:43 (UTC).

FUNCTIONAL EVALUATION TESTING OF FLORIDA INC AAO SHAWN CHABAK V ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 FUNCTIONAL EVALUATION TESTING OF FLORIDA INC AAO SHAWN CHABAK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SURBER , MELANIE D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SURBER , MELANIE D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FUNCTIONAL EVALUATION TESTING OF FLORIDA INC AAO SHAWN CHABAK

Defendant and Respondent

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BERMAN , RUSSELL F

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BURKHARDT , BRYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/26/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4551823

07/27/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4551823

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/19/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER

08/19/2022:ANSWER

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

08/22/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

08/22/2022:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/23/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 9/6/2022 9:30:00 AM due to; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE; Notes: JUDGE SURBER 8/22/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: FB DFT- TO PLT'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DISCLOSURE OF PRINCIPAL EMAIL ADDRESS F/B B BURKHARDT OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4551823; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/27/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/27/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@THEBERMANLAWGROUP.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 9/6/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 9/6/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4551823; Notes: $185.00 4551823 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FUNCTIONAL EVALUATION TESTING OF FLORIDA INC (ASO SAEZ, JONATHAN) is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berman, Russell