This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/26/2022 at 15:17:54 (UTC).

FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY, LLC., D/B/A UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE V GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY, LLC , D/B/A UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SURBER , MELANIE D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SURBER , MELANIE D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY, LLC., D/B/A UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LONG , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/17/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/17/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4468966

05/18/2022:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4468966

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/03/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/06/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

06/13/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/13/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8/12/22 @9AM VIA ZOOM JUDGE SURBER ON 6/13/22

06/13/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8/12/22 @9AM VIA ZOOM JUDGE SURBER ON 6/13/22

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

06/14/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8/12/22 @9AM VIA ZOOM JUDGE SURBER ON 6/13/22; Notes: GRANTING MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8/12/22 @9AM VIA ZOOM JUDGE SURBER ON 6/13/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - 06/2/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B MICHAEL J LONG ESQ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4468966; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/18/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/18/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 6/14/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 6/14/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4468966; Notes: $90.00 4468966 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK ESQ, KENNETH B