This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/14/2020 at 19:08:46 (UTC).

FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY LLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE V GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY LLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLORIDA ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGERY LLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK ESQ, KENNETH B

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/13/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 3679432

07/10/2020:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 3679432

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/10/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:#6 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - 08/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3679432; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$90.00; total Amount Paid:$90.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due:$80.00; Amount Paid:$80.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 9/1/2020 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 9/1/2020 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 3679432; Notes:$90.00 3679432 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less