This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 12/27/2021 at 19:15:03 (UTC).

FLORIDA INTEGRATED MEDICAL SERVICES A/A/O NADEGE PIERRE V OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 FLORIDA INTEGRATED MEDICAL SERVICES A/A/O NADEGE PIERRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLORIDA INTEGRATED MEDICAL SERVICES A/A/O NADEGE PIERRE

Defendant and Respondent

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISCHETTI , MICHAEL J

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

REYNOLDS , GEORGE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/22/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/22/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4258101

11/23/2021:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4258101

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/02/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

DEMAND FOR:

12/21/2021:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/21/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B G REYNOLDS OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes:JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 12/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4258101; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/23/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/23/2021; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:MFPAESQ@GMAIL.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/11/2022 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/11/2022 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4258101; Notes:$65.00 4258101 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Intergrated Medical Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fischetti, Michael James