This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 22:41:42 (UTC).

FLAGSTAR BANK V ADIEL INVESTMENTS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 FLAGSTAR BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ADIEL INVESTMENTS LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLAGSTAR BANK

Respondents and Defendants

ADIEL INVESTMENTS LLC

CAMERON , MAXINE A

PREFFERED CREDIT INC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES NORTH

VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOLAN , IAN

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $1,003.10 ON RECEIPT 4456096

05/06/2022:PAID $1,003.10 ON RECEIPT 4456096

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/05/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MAXINE A. CAMERON - 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNITED STATE OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - 05/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PREFERRED CREDIT, INC - 05/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES NORTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC - 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS' ASSOCIATION - 05/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ADIEL INVESTMENTS LLC - 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4456096; Receipt Amount: $1,003.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,003.10; total Amount Paid: $1,003.10; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Answers@DALlegal.com AS TO MAXINE A CAMERON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Answers@DALlegal.com AS TO ADIEL INVESTMENTS LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes: EXHIBIT E NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes: FINANCIAL STATEMENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes: EXHIBIT C FORECLOSURE QUESTIONNAIRE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes: EXHIBIT B PLT/LENDERS LOSS MITIGATION INFORMATION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes: NOTICE TO HOMEOWNERS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES NORTH is a litigant

Latest cases where VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOC is a litigant

Latest cases where Flagstar Bank Fsb is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLAN , IAN C