Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 00:32:44 (UTC).

FLAGSTAR BANK FSB V HOGAN, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2012 FLAGSTAR BANK FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HOGAN, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLAGSTAR BANK FSB

Defendants and Respondents

HOGAN, MICHAEL

HOGAN, MARGIE

BBCC PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

COUNTRY FAIR AT BOYNTON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

CAPITAL ONE BANK

SOUTHERN HOMES EXT

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

HOGAN , MICHAEL

ISPC

HOGAN , MARGIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARCUS , ANDREW P

NORDBACK , ERIC MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CORTEZ , LARRY T

GLASS , TIMOTHY G

GINSBERG , MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 26490 PAGE 1090

12/04/2013:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 26490 PAGE 1090

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/11/2013:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

AGREED ORDER

12/07/2012:AGREED ORDER

BOND

12/05/2012:BOND

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/28/2012:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/07/2012:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/16/2012:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER

10/15/2012:ANSWER

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2016
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $100.00 on Check Number 5388 to SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY; Notes:DISB REQUEST FOR SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER, UNCLAIMED FUNDS F.S. 116.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 26490 PAGE 1090; Notes:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF FLAGSTAR BANK FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF FLAGSTAR BANK FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:OF DEPOSITIONS ON DEFENDANTS MICHAEL HOGAN AND MARGIE HOGAN FOR FRIDAY APRIL 5, 2013 AT 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:FRIDAY, APRIL 5, 2013 2:00 P.M AND 4:00 P.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO:; Notes:DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TITLED DEMAND FOR WRITTEN VERIFICATION OF REINSTATEMENT AND PAYOFF FIGURES FOR CONSUMAR DEBT Filed by PLAINTIFF FLAGSTAR BANK FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:AND MOTION TO STRIKE Filed by PLAINTIFF FLAGSTAR BANK FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $7.00 on Check Number 32284 to MCCALLA RAYMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER; Notes:EXTENDING TIME FOR FLAGSTAR BANK TO RESPOND TO DFTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DISCOVERY, ON OR BEFORE 1/11/2013. H HARRISON. DTD 12/5/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2015
  • Receipt Number:CAMB1041349; Receipt Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB736287; Receipt Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713775; Receipt Amount: $922.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713775; Receipt Amount: $13.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713775; Receipt Amount: $83.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,111.60; total Amount Paid:$1,111.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Due Date:12/07/2012; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Due Date:09/21/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Due Date:09/21/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Due Date:09/21/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ISPC is a litigant

Latest cases where Flagstar Bank Fsb is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GINSBERG, MICHAEL DAVID