This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/28/2021 at 19:08:55 (UTC).

FIRST CHOICE CHIROPRACTIC AND MEDICAL CENTER LLC (ASSIGNEE OF COMPERE, SAMSON) V ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 FIRST CHOICE CHIROPRACTIC AND MEDICAL CENTER LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMPERE, SAMSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FIRST CHOICE CHIROPRACTIC AND MEDICAL CENTER LLC (ASSIGNEE OF COMPERE, SAMSON)

Respondent and Defendant

ALLSTATE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/23/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

11/23/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/23/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/23/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

11/23/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4259668

11/24/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4259668

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4259668; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/4/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/4/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4259668; Notes:$185.00 4259668 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST CHOICE CHIROPRACTIC & MEDICAL CENTER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPER , CHRIS