This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:37:20 (UTC).

FINDLING, STEFANIE R.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 FINDLING, STEFANIE R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURIE , LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LAURIE , LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY

Decedent

FINDLING , STEFANIE R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

RUBIN , JENNA G

KLINGSBERG , JORDAN L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3898144; Receipt Amount: $36.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$437.00; total Amount Paid:$437.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/04/2021; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due:$36.00; Amount Paid:$36.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPAID $36.00 ON RECEIPT 3898144; Notes:$36.00 3898144 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REP JDG L LAURIE DTD 2/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 32168 PAGE 1750-1751; Notes:JDG L LAURIE DTD 2/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OATH OF CORPORATE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE ADDRESS DESIGNATION FOR PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Notes:ADDRESS DESIGNATION FOR PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes:S/B JUDGE LAURIE ON 1/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF MARGARET SMITH AKA MARGARET FRANCES SMITH ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF CORPORATE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE F/B RICHARD DENAPOLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF MARGARET SMITH AKA MARGARET FRANCES SMITH F/B CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY. RUBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:F/B CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY. RUBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF FOR WILL F/B CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY; Notes:FOR WILL F/B CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:COPY OF WILL RECEIPT F/B CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:F/B CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN , JENNA G