This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 22:43:00 (UTC).

FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC V GALLUP, EILEEN K

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GALLUP, EILEEN K. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC

Defendants and Respondents

GALLUP , EILEEN K

RIDALL FINKBINER , SUSAN A

RIDALL MCCARTHY , HOLLY ANNE

RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST ALLAN E RIDALL DECEASED

UNKNOWN PARTY #1

UNKNOWN PARTY #2

UNKNOWN PARTY #3

UNKNOWN PARTY #4

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

DILTS , DAVID

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SUGARMAN , DEBORAH S

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS BOOK 33642 PAGE 1229-1229

06/10/2022:LIS PENDENS BOOK 33642 PAGE 1229-1229

REPLY/RESPONSE

07/18/2022:REPLY/RESPONSE

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/18/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER

06/29/2022:ANSWER

RESPONSE TO: F/B EILEEN GALLUP PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ALLAN RIDALL DECEASED

06/28/2022:RESPONSE TO: F/B EILEEN GALLUP PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ALLAN RIDALL DECEASED

MOTION MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ATTORNEY AD LITEM, AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

06/21/2022:MOTION MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ATTORNEY AD LITEM, AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

PAID $1,004.10 ON RECEIPT 4501814

06/14/2022:PAID $1,004.10 ON RECEIPT 4501814

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/10/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COMPLAINT

06/10/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes: TO DFT'S RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMTIVE DEFENSES - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING 08/09/2022 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO PLT'S COMPLAINT - F/B DFT RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: F/B EILEEN GALLUP PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ALLAN RIDALL DECEASED; Notes: F/B EILEEN GALLUP PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ALLAN RIDALL DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ATTORNEY AD LITEM, AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM; Notes: MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ATTORNEY AD LITEM, AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4501814; Receipt Amount: $1,004.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,004.10; total Amount Paid: $1,004.10; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/14/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/14/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/14/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST ALLAN E RIDALL DECEASED EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO SUSAN A RIDALL FINKBINER A/K/A SUSAN RIDALL EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO HOLLY ANNE RIDALL MCCARTHY AKA HOLLY MCCARTHY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO EILEEN K GALLUP A/K/A/ EILEEN GALLUP AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ALLAN E RIDALL DECEASED EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33642 PAGE 1229-1229; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Michael Dilts