This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 01:43:09 (UTC).

FIGOTA CAPITAL LLC V HAUSERMAN LAW GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 FIGOTA CAPITAL LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HAUSERMAN LAW GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTZ , JAMES L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARTZ , JAMES L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner, Respondent and Counter Defendant

FIGOTA CAPITAL LLC

Defendants, Petitioners, Respondents and Counter Plaintiffs

BOYD , RANDOLPH

FIGOTA CAPITAL LLC

HAUSERMAN LAW GROUP PLLC

WATERS EDGE AT BRIAR BAY ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANTS

HAUSERMAN , JOSHUA

HAUSERMAN LAW GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Respondent, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

DAMON , CONRAD

CHOUDHRY , LABEED A

GOLDMAN , KEITH A

Defendant, Petitioner, Respondent and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

LUBLINER , RICHARD SCOTT

KELVY , NATHAN A

DAMON , CONRAD

CHOUDHRY , LABEED A

GOLDMAN , KEITH A

SUGARMAN , DEBORAH S

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

08/12/2019:MOTION TO WITHDRAW

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

08/08/2019:MOTION TO WITHDRAW

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/26/2019:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/12/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

COUNTERCLAIM

05/22/2019:COUNTERCLAIM

ORDER M. SASSER ON DFT, RANDOLPH BOYD'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S 2ND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE - GRANTED. DFT BOYD SHALL FILE AN ANSWER BY 5/22/19. DTD 5/1/19

05/01/2019:ORDER M. SASSER ON DFT, RANDOLPH BOYD'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S 2ND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE - GRANTED. DFT BOYD SHALL FILE AN ANSWER BY 5/22/19. DTD 5/1/19

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/22/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/22/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

AGREED ORDER M SASSER: ON DFT RANOLPH BOYD'S MOTION TO DISMISS TO PLT'S COMPLAINT: GRANED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND PLT SHALL HAVE 20 DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. DTD 4-5-19

04/05/2019:AGREED ORDER M SASSER: ON DFT RANOLPH BOYD'S MOTION TO DISMISS TO PLT'S COMPLAINT: GRANED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND PLT SHALL HAVE 20 DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. DTD 4-5-19

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/20/2019:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/18/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/13/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/08/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

01/17/2019:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/11/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2948869

12/06/2018:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2948869

PAID $961.60 ON RECEIPT 2936171

11/27/2018:PAID $961.60 ON RECEIPT 2936171

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.SECTION 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION F/B PLT

11/27/2018:NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.SECTION 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION F/B PLT

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:CROSS-NOTICE OF HEARING 08/26/2019 09:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:J MARTZ DTD 8/13/19 SPECIALLY SET - 8/26/19 @ 9:30AM IN CTRM 10A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Notes:(AMENDED) AS COUNSEL F/B ATTY LUBLINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 08/28/2019 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Notes:AS COUNSEL - F/B LUBLINER LAW PLLC OBO DFT RANDOLPH BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:COUNTERCLAIM F/B PLT/CDFT FIGOTA CAPITAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO REQUIRE DFT/CPLT TO POST BOND F/B PLT/CDFT FIGOTA CAPITAL LLC; Notes:TO REQUIRE DFT/CPLT TO POST BOND F/B PLT/CDFT FIGOTA CAPITAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY CONRAD DAMON OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • Due Date:05/23/2019; Description:8CTP2 - 900 Foreclo crossclaim counterpet_070117; Amount Due:$900.00; Amount Paid:$900.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Due Date:12/12/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less