Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 00:33:21 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION V JORGENSEN, GERDA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2012 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JORGENSEN, GERDA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

JORGENSEN, GERDA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GERDA JORGENSEN

SVENDSEN, JORGEN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JORGEN SVENDSEN

BOCA BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SVENDSEN, CARSTEN

BANK OF AMERICA NA

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION # 1

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION # 2

SVENDSEN , CARSTEN

JORGENSEN , GERDA

SVENDSEN , JORGEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PASCAL , MARY

COHN , RICHARD P

KARASIK , SETH M

ROSALER , BRIAN L

KLEIN , CLIFFORD

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KRAVIT , CORY B

CHOUDHRY , LABEED

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/10/2014:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF SALE

10/24/2014:NOTICE OF SALE

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

07/28/2014:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

OBJECTION

07/07/2014:OBJECTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/28/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/27/2014:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/23/2014:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER

05/09/2014:ORDER

AGREED ORDER

05/06/2014:AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/24/2014:NOTICE OF SERVICE

DOR FORECLOSURE FORM

04/16/2014:DOR FORECLOSURE FORM

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/21/2014:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

BOND

03/28/2013:BOND

AGREED ORDER

12/13/2012:AGREED ORDER

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/31/2012:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/17/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/17/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • CHECK ISSUED; Notes:Deposit (Led_ID: 560638 Case#: F.S. 116.21 JULY ADVERTISEMENT) Check #: 00005629 for $100 was disbursed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:2019623 $100.00 SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 27218 PAGE 1461; Notes:ISSUED TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED; Notes:A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $60.00 was made on receipt CAMB953791. Filed by PLAINTIFF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of $60.00 was made on receipt CAMB953790. Filed by PLAINTIFF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB952801. Filed by PLAINTIFF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • BID SHEET; Notes:INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; Notes:SOLD TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FOR $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713505; Receipt Amount: $1,981.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$2,380.10; total Amount Paid:$2,380.10; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Due Date:01/30/2017; Description:Civil Bond Disbursement; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Due Date:12/02/2014; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Due Date:12/02/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Due Date:11/26/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Due Date:03/28/2013; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$108.50; Amount Paid:$108.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Due Date:09/21/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Due Date:09/21/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Due Date:09/21/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOUDHRY , LABEED A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAVIT, CORY BRIAN