This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:41:38 (UTC).

FAWCETT, MARY CATHERINE

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 FAWCETT, MARY CATHERINE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURIE , LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LAURIE , LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

FAWCETT , STEVEN E

FAWCETT , CLINTON W

Decedent

FAWCETT , MARY CATHERINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

PONNOCK , ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3906509; Receipt Amount: $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$417.00; total Amount Paid:$417.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/11/2021; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due:$16.00; Amount Paid:$16.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketPAID $16.00 ON RECEIPT 3906509; Notes:$16.00 3906509 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 32178 PAGE 1594-1595; Notes:S/B JDG LAURA B. LAURIE DTD 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:AND APPOINTING OF P/R., S/B JDG LAURA B. LAURIE DTD 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPROBATE CHECKLIST; Notes:OPENING CHECKLIST FOR PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION OF TESTATE ESTATE F/B JUDGE L LAURIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketWILL BOOK 32178 PAGE 1465-1474; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3875539; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PETRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE F/B CLINTON W FAWCETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/B STEVEN E FAWCETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/B CLINTON W FAWCETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B STEVEN E FAWCETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B CLINTON W FAWCETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:COPY F/B PETRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:COPY F/B PETRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PETR, CLINTON W FAWCETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PONNOCK , ANDREW