This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/08/2019 at 17:31:37 (UTC).

FARBER, HAROLD J

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 FARBER, HAROLD J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHEFTS , DAVID S

Decedent

FARBER , HAROLD J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COHEN , EDWARD B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • NOTICE FORMAL - F/B EDWARD COHEN; Notes:FORMAL - F/B EDWARD COHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF WITNESS TO WILL - F/B WALTER FRIEDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF WITNESS TO WILL - F/B DOROTHY FRIEDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • PAID $7.00 ON RECEIPT 3004722; Notes:$7.00 3004722 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • WAIVER; Notes:OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE & BOND F/B FLORENCE LONYAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2987200; Notes:$401.00 2987200 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • WILL; Notes:F/B ATTY COHEN OBO DAVID S. SHEFTS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:F/B ATTY COHEN OBO DAVID S. SHEFTS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B ATTY COHEN OBO DAVID S. SHEFTS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Receipt Number:3004722; Receipt Amount: $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Receipt Number:2987200; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$408.00; total Amount Paid:$408.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Due Date:01/22/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$7.00; Amount Paid:$7.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Due Date:01/08/2019; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less