This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/11/2019 at 14:54:18 (UTC).

FALS, JUAN V VIDAL MD, RAMON

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 FALS, JUAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against VIDAL MD, RAMON. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FALS , JUAN

FALS , LAURA

Defendants and Respondents

VIDAL MD , RAMON

LIEBERFARB MD , ROSS I

PARAGON CONTRACTING SERVICES LLC

LIEERMAN DO , DEBORAH

ENVISION HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

ICS RADIOLOGY INC

GORMEZANO MD , KYLE R

SHERIDAN RADIOLOGY SERVICES OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SMITH , KEVIN C

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CIOTOLI , EUGENE L

MORING , PHILIP F

WEBBER , JOHN C

LYNN , JONATHAN P

CITRON , HOWARD L

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/02/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

06/27/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

06/19/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/07/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/29/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/29/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/08/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

04/05/2019:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

04/05/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

04/05/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

03/15/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

03/14/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3024941

02/05/2019:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3024941

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $408.50 ON RECEIPT 3013794

01/28/2019:PAID $408.50 ON RECEIPT 3013794

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/23/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

01/23/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:DEFENDANT, KYLE R. GORMEZANO, M.D.'S NOTICE OF HEARING 08/21/2019 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT. DEBORAH LIEBERMAN, D.O.'S, LIFE EXPECTANCY INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION; Notes:TO DFT KYLE GORMEZANO MD'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY DATED JUNE 27, 2019 F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, DEBORAH LIEBERMAN, D.O.'S, MEDICARE REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, DEBORAH LIEBERMAN, D.O.'S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO DEFENDANT, DEBORAH LIEBERNIAN, D.O.'S, SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, DEBORAH LIEBERNIAN, D.O.'S, LIFE EXPECTANCY INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, DEBORAH LIEBERMAN, D.O.'S, CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Receipt Number:3053439; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Receipt Number:3024941; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Receipt Number:3013794; Receipt Amount: $408.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$428.50; total Amount Paid:$428.50; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Due Date:02/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Due Date:02/05/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Due Date:01/28/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$7.50; Amount Paid:$7.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Due Date:01/28/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less