This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/07/2022 at 19:52:32 (UTC).

EXP REALTY LLC V WHITE, AUSTIN

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 EXP REALTY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WHITE, AUSTIN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

EXP REALTY LLC

Defendant and Respondent

WHITE , AUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LAING , CHAD R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

09/07/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

COMPLAINT

09/07/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4605533

09/08/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4605533

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/13/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $3.00 ON RECEIPT 4613988

09/15/2022:PAID $3.00 ON RECEIPT 4613988

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/04/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE AUSTIN WHITE JAMES W. WHITE TRUST - 10/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4613988; Receipt Amount: $3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $414.00; total Amount Paid: $414.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/15/2022; Description: CA Circuit Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $3.00; Amount Paid: $3.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $3.00 ON RECEIPT 4613988; Notes: $3.00 4613988 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY LAING OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4605533; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/08/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/08/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4605533; Notes: $411.00 4605533 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: STANDING ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND SUBMISSION OF AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN IN CIVIL CASES; F/B PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: chad@lwslegal.com;filings@lwslegal.com;natasha@lwslegal.com AUSTIN WHITE AS TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF JAMES A WHITE UAD JUNE 2 2017 AS AMENDD AKA JAMES W WHITE TRUST SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXP Realty, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAING , CHAD ROBERT