This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/21/2022 at 22:45:32 (UTC).

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY V CANA LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against CANA LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

CANA LLC

UNITED CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LONG , MORGAN E

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/06/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER APPOINTING

05/24/2022:ORDER APPOINTING

MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/23/2022:MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/20/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4462950

05/12/2022:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4462950

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/12/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/12/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/12/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/12/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/12/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/12/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

05/12/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT CIVIL 2 PAGE STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

05/12/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT CIVIL 2 PAGE STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT CIVIL 2 PAGE STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

05/12/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT CIVIL 2 PAGE STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

COMPLAINT

05/12/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED UNITED CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC UNITED RECONSTRUCTION GROUP INC - 05/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING; Notes: HAFELE DTD 5/24/22: PROCESS SERVER ROCK LEGAL SERVICES & INVESTIGATIONS INC /JEFF VERI OR BILL ROSE TO SERVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CANA LLC - 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@derreverelaw.com;signazzitto@derreverelaw.com AS TO DFT UNITED CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC AKA UNITED RECONSTRUCTION GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@derreverelaw.com;signazzitto@derreverelaw.com AS TO DFT CANA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4462950; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST TO DEFENDANT CANA LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST FREQUEST TO DEFENDANT UNITED CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC A/K/A UNITED RECONSTRUCTION GROUP INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CANA LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT CIVIL 2 PAGE STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes: eservice@derreverelaw.com;signazzitto@derreverelaw.com CASE MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT CIVIL 2 PAGE STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT CIVIL 2 PAGE STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes: eservice@derreverelaw.com;signazzitto@derreverelaw.com CASE MANAGEMENT CIRCUIT CIVIL 2 PAGE STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where United Reconstruction Group Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Long, Morgan Elise