This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 03:56:59 (UTC).

EVANS, KARYN V FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 EVANS, KARYN filed an Other lawsuit against FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

EVANS , KARYN

Defendant and Respondent

FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JENSEN , DANIEL C

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

JURMAN , RORY ERIC

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE

01/27/2022:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

01/27/2022:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

01/25/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/21/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

01/06/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

01/06/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

12/20/2021:ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/01/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

11/16/2021:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

CERTIFICATE

11/09/2021:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE DEFENDANT, FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED CORPORATION'S, NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON PLAINTIFF

10/05/2021:NOTICE DEFENDANT, FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED CORPORATION'S, NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE

10/01/2021:CERTIFICATE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/01/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

09/28/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

09/21/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:DEFENDANT, FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED CORPORATION'S, CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes:RE-NOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 03/28/2022 12:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION KRISTINE HORSTMAN 01/26/2022 02:00:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS 01/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 01/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes:JUDGE MARX DTD 12/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DENISE LE BEL 01/06/2022 02:00:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:DEFENDANT, FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED CORPORATION'S, CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4003101; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/27/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/27/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4003101; Notes:$411.00 4003101 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:djensen@foryourrights.com;kharris@foryourrights.com AS TO FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED CORPORATION EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY JENSEN OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Four Seasons Hotels Limited Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENSEN , DANIEL C