This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/18/2022 at 19:54:22 (UTC).

ESTATE OF ANTHONY BOULCH V PATCH REEF TITLE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 ESTATE OF ANTHONY BOULCH filed an Other lawsuit against PATCH REEF TITLE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ESTATE OF ANTHONY BOULCH

Defendants and Respondents

HERT , DENNIS

HERT , PAMELA

PATCH REEF TITLE COMPANY INC

UNITED WHOLESALE MORTGAGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BEBERGAL , MARC L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION

02/16/2022:PETITION

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4351784

02/17/2022:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4351784

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/18/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/25/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/25/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

PAID $40.00 ON RECEIPT 4367728

03/02/2022:PAID $40.00 ON RECEIPT 4367728

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/09/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

03/09/2022:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes:PATCH REEF TITLE COMPANY INC FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 03/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4367728; Receipt Amount: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$441.00; total Amount Paid:$441.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $40.00 ON RECEIPT 4367728; Notes:$40.00 4367728 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 03/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO DFT PAMELA HERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO DFT UNITED WHOLESALE MORTGAGE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO DFT PATCH REEF TITLE COMPANY INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF HEARING 03/01/2022 08:45:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4351784; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/17/2022; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4351784; Notes:$401.00 4351784 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR PURE BILL OF DISCOVERY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Wholesale Mortgage LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bebergal, Marc L