This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/24/2021 at 19:52:18 (UTC).

ENTWISTLE, KATHLEEN M V FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 ENTWISTLE, KATHLEEN M filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ENTWISTLE , KATHLEEN M

Respondent and Defendant

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SPALLINA ESQ, RANDI PERRY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION

11/18/2021:PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4255009

11/19/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4255009

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/29/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

FINAL ORDER

12/03/2021:FINAL ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED - OTHER; Notes:DO - DISPOSED OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER; Notes:NUTT; AND JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT IS GRANTED DTD 12/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC - 11/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4255009; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/19/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/19/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4255009; Notes:$411.00 4255009 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:rspallina@bressler.com;joliva@bressler.com AS TO FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC (FIRNA) EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:IN THE FORM OF A MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGMENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPALLINA RANDI PERRY