This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 23:54:51 (UTC).

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO GPR10010224401 AS SUBROGEE OF GREENFIELD PARTNERS LLC V WICKER SMITH OHARA MCCOY & FORD PA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO GPR10010224401 AS SUBROGEE OF GREENFIELD PARTNERS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against WICKER SMITH OHARA MCCOY FORD PA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COATES JR, HOWARD K and KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COATES JR, HOWARD K

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO GPR10010224401 AS SUBROGEE OF GREENFIELD PARTNERS LLC

STARR TECHNICAL RISK AGENCY INC SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY SLSTPTY11007017 AS SUBROGEE OF GREENFIELD PARTNERS LLC

UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE GROUP SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO BP2555691G AS SUBROGEE OF FISHER POTTER HODAS PLLC

Defendants and Respondents

DS SERVICES OF AMERICA INC

WICKER SMITH OHARA MCCOY & FORD PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GITKIN , JAMES P

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEE , CHRISTOPHER W

PEREZ-MARTINEZ , MARILYN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/23/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/23/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4152593

08/25/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4152593

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/30/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/30/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/09/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/14/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

09/14/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

DISCLOSURE

09/14/2021:DISCLOSURE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/05/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/12/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/16/2022:ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF THIS CASE TO THE GENERAL TRACK S/B JUDGE S KERNER DTD 2/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR WICKER SMITH O'HARA MCCOY & FORD PA AND SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY WITHIN SAME FIRM FILED BY ATTY PEREZ-MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B DFT DS SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE; Notes:NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE - F/B ATTY NAOMI ZIMMERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY NAOMI ZIMMERMAN OBO WICKER SMITH O'HARA MCCOY & FORD PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY NAOMI ZIMMERMAN OBO WICKER SMITH O'HARA MCCOY & FORD PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B DFT WICKER SMITH O'HARA MCCOY & FORD P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED WICKER, SMITH, O'HARA, MCCOY & FORD P.A., - 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DS SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC - 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4152593; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/25/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/25/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/25/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4152593; Notes:$421.00 4152593 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jim@salpetergitkin.com;tina@salpetergitkin.com AS TO DS SERVICES OF AMERICA INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jim@salpetergitkin.com;tina@salpetergitkin.com AS TO WICKER SMITH OHARA MCCOY & FORD PA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DS SERVICES OF AMERICA INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases where Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gitkin, James P