This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/11/2023 at 23:23:02 (UTC).

ELPERNORD, DELAND JIMMY V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 ELPERNORD, DELAND JIMMY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ELPERNORD , DELAND JIMMY

SANNON , SALLY

Defendant and Respondent

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DANIELS , MONICA E

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WILLIAMS , NICK

DEMAHY , DANIELLE

EIKNER , CLAUDIA R

REEVES , ALECIA

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO

12/29/2022:AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO

EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

12/29/2022:EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

DISCLOSURE

12/29/2022:DISCLOSURE

WITNESS LIST

12/29/2022:WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/08/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

09/26/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

09/22/2022:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/16/2022:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

SUBPOENA ISSUED

09/08/2022:SUBPOENA ISSUED

AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO

09/08/2022:AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO

TRANSCRIPT

08/31/2022:TRANSCRIPT

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

08/17/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

08/17/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/17/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/16/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUBPOENA ISSUED

08/16/2022:SUBPOENA ISSUED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/16/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER CURLEY; (EX PARTE) ON DFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; PLTF SHALL RESPOND TO DFT'S DISCOVERY WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THIS ORDER DTD 8/15/2022

08/15/2022:ORDER CURLEY; (EX PARTE) ON DFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; PLTF SHALL RESPOND TO DFT'S DISCOVERY WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THIS ORDER DTD 8/15/2022

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO; Notes: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (COORDINATED WITH PLAINTJFS ' COUNSEL BERNARD MICALIZZI ON BEHALF OF CENTURION CLAIMS LLC 01/09/2023 10:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes: DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT LIST IN COMPLIANCE WITH COURTS UNIFORM TRIAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE; Notes: DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S EXPERT DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Notes: DEFENDANTS WITNESS LIST IN COMPLIANCE WITH COURTS UNIFORM TRIAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - F/B ATTY ALECIA REEVES OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes: NOTICE OF MEDIATION 02/06/2023 10:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE BERNARD MICALIZZI CENTURION CLAIMS, LLC ON 09/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA ISSUED; Notes: AMENDED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION BERNARD MICALIZZI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO; Notes: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM BERNARD MICALIZZI 12/13/2022 10 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/19/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4317339; Notes: $411.00 4317339 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS FIELD ADJUSTER TIME AND DATE TBD F/B ATTY DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: LIVE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE TIME AND DATE TBD F/B ATTY DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST REQUEST TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mdaniels@thedaniels-lawgroup.com;Jraimondi@thedaniels-lawgroup.com;service@thedaniels-lawgroup.com AS TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less