This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 08:55:27 (UTC).

ELITE SPINE GROUP INC V GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 ELITE SPINE GROUP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SURBER , MELANIE D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SURBER , MELANIE D

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ELITE SPINE GROUP INC

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SEYMOUR , RONALD W

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/23/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4515979

06/27/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4515979

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/13/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

07/26/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUBSTITUTE GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - 07/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4515979; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/27/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/27/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM FOR DFT, E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 7/26/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 7/26/2022 9:30 AM SURBER, MELANIE D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4515979; Notes: $185.00 4515979 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: FOR DAMAGES FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELITE SPINE GROUP, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant