This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/21/2022 at 15:23:36 (UTC).

ELANA KAPLOVE D.C. P.A. DBA BACK IN BALANCE (ASSIGNEE OF FERRARI, DONNA) V LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 ELANA KAPLOVE D C P A DBA BACK IN BALANCE ASSIGNEE OF FERRARI, DONNA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ELANA KAPLOVE D.C. P.A. DBA BACK IN BALANCE (ASSIGNEE OF FERRARI, DONNA)

Defendant and Respondent

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PUGH ESQ, HUNTER G

WHELTON , CHRISTOPHER BIJAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/12/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/12/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/12/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/12/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/12/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4463593

05/13/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4463593

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/13/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING

05/31/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/31/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/03/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

DEMAND FOR:

06/03/2022:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

06/10/2022:NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes: OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFO & AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B CHRISTOPHER BIJAN WHELTON ESQ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes: JURY TRIAL E FILED BY DFT ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION E FILED BY HUNTER PUGH ESQ OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VIA FLA CFO 5/19/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4463593; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/13/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/13/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 6/21/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 6/21/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4463593; Notes: $65.00 4463593 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELANA KAPLOVE DC PA (PATIENT: BRANDDOM HIDALGO) is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPER , CHRIS