This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/07/2023 at 14:51:21 (UTC).

DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER INC A/A/O JUDE LOUIS V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/18/2022 DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER INC A/A/O JUDE LOUIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER INC A/A/O JUDE LOUIS

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LIEBERMAN , JACOB CHAD

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BARBER , CECILIA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/18/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/18/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4717331

12/20/2022:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4717331

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/12/2023:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/12/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

DEMAND FOR:

01/12/2023:DEMAND FOR:

MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

01/12/2023:MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/13/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

01/15/2023:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

01/17/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/04/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE; Notes: SIGNED JUDGE CORLEW 1/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT; Notes: TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes: JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (STIPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/20/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/20/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/20/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LAWLIEBERMAN@YAHOO.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/17/2023 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/17/2023 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4717331; Notes: $90.00 4717331 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less