Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/09/2021 at 19:23:02 (UTC).

DURRANCE, SCOTT V ST JEAN, PIERRE A

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 DURRANCE, SCOTT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ST JEAN, PIERRE A. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COATES JR, HOWARD K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COATES JR, HOWARD K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DURRANCE , SCOTT

Defendants and Respondents

AJINKYA , ARVIND

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

TOWN OF LANTANA

PALM BEACH COUNTY

ST JEAN , PIERRE A

CENTURY 21 REAL ESTATE LLC

DURRANCE , GAY

HOGAN , JACQUELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BUTLER , JONATHAN B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FAHEY , RACHEL M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/29/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/20/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/20/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION TO STRIKE

09/30/2020:MOTION TO STRIKE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/18/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER GRANTING HCOATES JR DTD 9/8/20 DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION -DFT SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMEBER 18 2020 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT

09/08/2020:ORDER GRANTING HCOATES JR DTD 9/8/20 DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION -DFT SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMEBER 18 2020 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/11/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER

08/07/2020:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/31/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/30/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/30/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/30/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3691958

07/23/2020:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3691958

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

07/15/2020:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020:COMPLAINT

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER HCOATES DTD 02/05/2021 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED AS FOLLOWS PLAINTIFF'S MTOION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S SECOND, THIRD AND FOURTH AMENDED AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Notes:HCOATES DTD 02/05/2021 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED AS FOLLOWS PLAINTIFF'S MTOION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S SECOND, THIRD AND FOURTH AMENDED AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION PIERRE ST JEAN 03/30/2021 10:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES F/B DFT PIERRE A ST JEAN PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 01/28/2021 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:(AMENDED) F/B PRO SE PIERRE A. ST. JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER HCOATES JR DTD 11/12/20 ON PLTS MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:HCOATES JR DTD 11/12/20 ON PLTS MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 11/10/2020 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:JBUTLER@CIKLINLUBITZ.COM; SERVICE@CIKLINLUBITZ.COM; DFOGARTY@CIKLINLUBITZ.COM AS TO DFTS CENTURY 21 REAL ESTATE LLC TOWN OF LANTANA ARVIND AJINKYA D/B/A AJS H\ITERNATIONAL JACQUELINE HOGAN STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR THE ENTRY OF A CLERK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jmankoff@ciklinlubitz.com;service@ciklinlubitz.com AS TO DFT TOWN OF LANTANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $13.60 ON RECEIPT 3684179; Notes:$13.60 3684179 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31585 PAGE 619-621; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3679385; Receipt Amount: $1,913.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$7.50; Amount Paid:$7.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:800F3 CircCivil Real Prop$250,000 or more PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $1,913.50 ON RECEIPT 3679385; Notes:$1,913.50 3679385 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TOWN OF LANTANA is a litigant

Latest cases where Century 21 Real Estate LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAHEY , RACHEL M