Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/17/2019 at 00:40:00 (UTC).

DUBNER, RONALD N V ESTATE OF BRADLEY A DUBNER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 DUBNER, RONALD N filed an Other lawsuit against ESTATE OF BRADLEY A DUBNER DECEASED. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DUBNER , RONALD N

Defendants and Respondents

MONARCH OFFICE CENTER LTD

ESTATE OF BRADLEY A DUBNER DECEASED

BLR PROPERTIES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

STRUPP , LESLIE D

MORGAN STANLEY SMITH BARNEY LLC

INVESTORS MORTGAGE FUNDING CORP

INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP

FERRARO , FRANK A

DUBNER PROPERTIES LLC

MONARCH TOWNE CENTER LTD

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCDERMOTT , DANIEL L

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COLEMAN , GREGORY W

COATES ESQ, JOSEPH C

SERAFIN , STEPHANIE L

KREUSLER-WALSH , JANE

MERCIER-VARGAS , REBECCA

 

Court Documents

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

03/14/2018:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

01/31/2018:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/31/2018:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE TO: PLTF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT F/B DEFTS, FRANK A. FERRARO, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BRADLEY A. DUBNER AND SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE ANNETTE F. DUBNER TRUST AFREEMENT, AS AMENDED AND RESTATED; LESLIE D. STRUPP, INDIVIDUALLY, AS CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ANNETTE F. DUBNER, AND AS SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE ANNETTE F. DUBNER TRUST AGREEMENT, AS AMENDED AND RESTATED

12/20/2017:RESPONSE TO: PLTF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT F/B DEFTS, FRANK A. FERRARO, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF BRADLEY A. DUBNER AND SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE ANNETTE F. DUBNER TRUST AFREEMENT, AS AMENDED AND RESTATED; LESLIE D. STRUPP, INDIVIDUALLY, AS CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ANNETTE F. DUBNER, AND AS SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE ANNETTE F. DUBNER TRUST AGREEMENT, AS AMENDED AND RESTATED

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

08/23/2017:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

CERTIFIED COPY

08/23/2017:CERTIFIED COPY

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2312640

08/23/2017:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2312640

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:DEPO AS TO GEORGE WEINSTEIN 4/17/2018 @ 11AM F/B ATTY COLEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:OF SCOTT BOUCHNER ON 3/8/18 AT 10:00AM F/B ATTY SINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION; Notes:TO NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:SECOND RE-NOTICE OF UMC HEARING, TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 20, 2018 AT 8:45 AM FILED BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:FILED BY RONALD DUBNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO: DFTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE FILED BY RONALD DUBNER; Notes:DFTS MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE FILED BY RONALD DUBNER

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY; Notes:OF DOCKET FROM BROWARD COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT; Notes:SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LESLIE D STRUPP - BROWARD COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY; Notes:ORDER ON DFTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO PALM BEACH COUNTY - GTD - 7/17/17 - JUDGE ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT; Notes:SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO DUBNER PROPERTIES LLC - BROWARD COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT; Notes:CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2312640; Notes:$401.00 2312640 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Receipt Number:2312640; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Due Date:08/23/2017; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Industrial Development Corporation of South Africa Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDERMOTT , DANIEL L