This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/12/2021 at 01:28:27 (UTC).

DREXEL METALS INC V LEO PREMIER HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 DREXEL METALS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEO PREMIER HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DREXEL METALS INC

Respondents and Defendants

LEO , FRANK

LEO PREMIER HOMES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE , DAVID

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

SCHWARTZ , WAYNE H

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/05/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER GOODMAN; GRANTING DFTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MOTION IS GRANTED DTD 2/3/2021

02/03/2021:AGREED ORDER GOODMAN; GRANTING DFTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MOTION IS GRANTED DTD 2/3/2021

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/19/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

AGREED ORDER GOODMAN; GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO STRIKE; MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART DTD 1/14/2021

01/14/2021:AGREED ORDER GOODMAN; GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO STRIKE; MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART DTD 1/14/2021

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

01/13/2021:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/07/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/21/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/09/2020:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/04/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

11/17/2020:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

AGREED ORDER GOODMAN DTD 11/10/20 : GRANTING DFT'S 2ND MOT FOR EXT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT. DFTS HAVE UNTIL 11/30/20 TO RESPOND.

11/10/2020:AGREED ORDER GOODMAN DTD 11/10/20 : GRANTING DFT'S 2ND MOT FOR EXT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT. DFTS HAVE UNTIL 11/30/20 TO RESPOND.

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

11/09/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/19/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/07/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/07/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/01/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3746619

09/16/2020:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3746619

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B DFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER GOODMAN; GRANTING DFTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MOTION IS GRANTED DTD 2/3/2021; Notes:GOODMAN; GRANTING DFTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MOTION IS GRANTED DTD 2/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO PLTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER GOODMAN; GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO STRIKE; MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART DTD 1/14/2021; Notes:GOODMAN; GRANTING PLTF'S MOTION TO STRIKE; MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART DTD 1/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF UMC HEARING 01/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR 01/14/2021 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES WITH INCORPORATED MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLTS VERIFIED COMPLAINT F/B DFTS LEO PREMIER HOMES LLC AND FRANK LEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:09/16/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3746619; Notes:$20.00 3746619 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:david@levine-legal.com;sarah@levine-legal.com AS TO DFT LEO PREMIER HOMES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:david@levine-legal.com;sarah@levine-legal.com AS TO DFT FRANK LEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3742996; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:09/14/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3742996; Notes:$401.00 3742996 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:VERIFIED F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DREXEL METALS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEO PREMIER HOMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARTZ , WAYNE H