This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/05/2023 at 01:16:03 (UTC).

DR JAGMOHAN VIROJA MD A/A/O DENESHA SAINT LOUIS V GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 DR JAGMOHAN VIROJA MD A/A/O DENESHA SAINT LOUIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DR JAGMOHAN VIROJA MD A/A/O DENESHA SAINT LOUIS

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MAHONEY , SHANNON M.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/01/2023:COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/01/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/01/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/01/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

02/01/2023:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4764613

02/02/2023:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4764613

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6K (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4764613; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@MAHONEYLEGAL.COM;SMMAHONEY@MAHONEYLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 3/7/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 3/7/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4764613; Notes: $65.00 4764613 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less