This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/04/2022 at 00:49:27 (UTC).

DORLEUS, JOUBERT V ULYSSE, VIVIANE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 DORLEUS, JOUBERT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ULYSSE, VIVIANE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHER , ROSEMARIE and KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHER , ROSEMARIE

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DORLEUS , JOUBERT

Defendant and Respondent

ULYSSE , VIVIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SINCKLER , NATASHIA A

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WEISS , SCOTT MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO COMPLY WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO MANDATORY DISCLOSURE F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:TO COUNTER-PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING PENSION INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4342077; Receipt Amount: $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$723.00; total Amount Paid:$723.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/09/2022; Description:7CTP CA Family Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due:$295.00; Amount Paid:$295.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketPAID $295.00 ON RECEIPT 4342077; Notes:$295.00 4342077 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes:F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCOUNTERCLAIM; Notes:ANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FZ: South Branch Family Division - FZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY SINCKLER OBO PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@sincklerlaw.com;natashia@sincklerlaw.com VIVIANE ULYSSE 5100 NORTHERN LIGHTS DR GREENACRES, FL 33463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINCKLER , NATASHIA A