This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 09:01:49 (UTC).

DONLINKANE, PATRICIA C V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2022 DONLINKANE, PATRICIA C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SURBER , MELANIE D and BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SURBER , MELANIE D

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DONLINKANE , PATRICIA C

Defendant and Respondent

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MILLER , SANDER LEE

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CAMPBELL , LINDA L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/20/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/20/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

03/20/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4404367

03/29/2022:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4404367

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4404367

03/30/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4404367

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/22/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF FILING

04/22/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/22/2022:MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes: PURSUANT TO FLA.STAT.S.627.70152 FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: SUPPLEMENTAL,PERSUASIVE AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF UNIVERSAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR NON-COMPLIANCE WITH FLA. STAT.627.70152 FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4404367; Receipt Amount: $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4404367; Notes: $310.00 4404367 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4404367 CREATED $10 OVERAGE; Notes: 4404367 CREATED $10 OVERAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/29/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: JMILLER@DIVORCEYES.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 4/27/2022 10:00 AM BRYSON, MARNI; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 4/27/2022 10:00 AM BRYSON, MARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4404367; Notes: $320.00 4404367 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER , SANDER LEE