This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/12/2019 at 19:23:45 (UTC).

DOMNICK, SEAN V TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/19/2019 DOMNICK, SEAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ALCIDE , SOPHONIE

DOMNICK , SEAN

Defendants and Respondents

BUTLER MD, HOWARD

INPHYNET CONTRACTING SERVICES LLC

DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER INC

FERBER MD, JEAN

SHERIDAN RADIOLOGY SERVICES OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC

DELRAY TRAUMA ASSOCIATES PA

HASBROUK HOLDINGS PA

WEST MD, MICHAEL

TUNG MD, CHIA-LING

WILLIAMS MD, ALEXANDER

ST MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER INC

BECKERMAN MD, MICHAEL

TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

WILKINSON MD, HUGH

FLETCHER MD, STEFFEN

OBGYN SPECIALISTS OF PALM BEACHES II LLC

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TEJEDOR , MARIA D

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COMRAS , MANUEL R

MORGAN JR ESQ, KENNETH W

HUNTER , M KATHERINE

CUTLER , HARRY L

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION

07/05/2019:OBJECTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/02/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/02/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/28/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

06/27/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION FOR MEDIATION

05/19/2019:MOTION FOR MEDIATION

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B HOWARD L. CITRON ESQ., OF THE LAW FIRM OF RISSMAN, BARRETT, HURT, DONAHUE, MCLAIN MANGAN P.A, AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DFT HOWARD BUTLER M.D.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B HOWARD L. CITRON ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION; Notes:TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANTS, TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION D/B/A DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER AND DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NOTICE OF SERVING FILIAL CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANTS, TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION D/B/A DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER AND DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NOTICE OF SERVING COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANTS, TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION D/B/A DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER AND DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICARE/MEDICAID INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANTS, TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION D/B/A DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER AND DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICAL MALPRACTICE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANTS, TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION D/B/A DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER AND DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANT, ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICARE & MEDICAID INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$27.50; Amount Paid:$27.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Due Date:05/21/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less