This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/04/2021 at 19:53:35 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V SCHMIDLIN, BOYD T

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCHMIDLIN, BOYD T. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant and Respondent

SCHMIDLIN , BOYD T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WARD , IASIA B

 

Court Documents

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

08/03/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET AUGUST 3, 2021 HEARING FOR ZOOM JUDGE CASTOR DTD 7/19/2021

07/19/2021:ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET AUGUST 3, 2021 HEARING FOR ZOOM JUDGE CASTOR DTD 7/19/2021

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/09/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

06/30/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

COMPLAINT

06/30/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4088629

07/01/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4088629

SUMMONS REQUESTED

06/30/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:4C (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLT ATTY PRESENT DFT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET AUGUST 3, 2021 HEARING FOR ZOOM JUDGE CASTOR DTD 7/19/2021; Notes:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET AUGUST 3, 2021 HEARING FOR ZOOM JUDGE CASTOR DTD 7/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BOYD T SCHMIDLIN - 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4088629; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/01/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/01/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:LAWFIRMFL@RSIEH.COM SUMMONS E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 8/3/2021 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 8/3/2021 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4088629; Notes:$310.00 4088629 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ward, Iasia B