This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 11/02/2022 at 22:47:58 (UTC).

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY V LEE, LATONYA ANN

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEE, LATONYA ANN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

LEE , LATONYA ANN

REED , BRIAN CURTIS

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCFARLANE, III , WILLIAM J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/23/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

09/23/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/23/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/23/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/23/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4626890

09/27/2022:PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4626890

NOTICE OF FILING

09/30/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

STIPULATION

09/30/2022:STIPULATION

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/30/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF FILING

10/03/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/03/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES - 09/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes: JOINT STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT, WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES F/B PLT & DFT, WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: JOINT STIPULATION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4626890; Receipt Amount: $431.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $431.00; total Amount Paid: $431.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/27/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/27/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/27/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST TO DFT BRIAN CURTIS REED F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: SECOND TO DFT LATONYA ANN LEE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DFT LATONYA ANN LEE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadingservice@mcfarlanedolanlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadingservice@mcfarlanedolanlaw.com AS TO LATONYA ANN LEE EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadingservice@mcfarlanedolanlaw.com AS TO BRIAN CURTIS REED EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR DECLATORY JUDGMENT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J MCFARLANE III, ESQ