Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 14:11:24 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY V SAGMAN, SUSAN F

Case Summary

On 09/20/2012 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SAGMAN, SUSAN F. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

SAGMAN, SUSAN F

GOLDBERG, MICHAEL A

CITIBANK FSB

BOCA FALLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

BW HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

BOCA WINDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

UNKNOWN TENANT #3

UNKNOWN TENANT #4

GOLDBERG , MICHAEL A

SAGMAN , SUSAN F

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ADAMS , JESSE

LAMB , SHAWNA G

MAYLOR , SUZETTE A

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BROUGH , DAVID L

ROSS , HARRY J

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE

06/11/2015:CERTIFICATE

BID SHEET

05/27/2015:BID SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

05/27/2015:CERTIFICATE OF SALE

FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 27306 PAGE 272

01/27/2015:FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 27306 PAGE 272

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

01/26/2015:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/29/2014:NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

09/15/2014:NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

DEFAULT

07/29/2013:DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/22/2013:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/26/2012:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/24/2012:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER

10/05/2012:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/03/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/03/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/20/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/20/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/20/2012:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS BOOK 025472 PAGE 00924

09/20/2012:LIS PENDENS BOOK 025472 PAGE 00924

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 27599 PAGE 1461; Notes:WAS SOLD TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-6AR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED; Notes:A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $3,183.40 was made on receipt CAMB999792. Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of $3,183.40 was made on receipt CAMB999791. Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB999616. Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • BID SHEET; Notes:INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; Notes:SOLD TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-6AR FOR $446,200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE OF SALE F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SALE; Notes:5/27/15 DEUTSCHE BANK V. SAGMAN Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY 05/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713240; Receipt Amount: $1,991.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713240; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$8,440.90; total Amount Paid:$8,440.90; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Due Date:05/28/2015; Description:Civil Doc Stamps PB; Amount Due:$3,123.40; Amount Paid:$3,123.40; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Due Date:05/28/2015; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Due Date:05/28/2015; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$3,183.40; Amount Paid:$3,183.40; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Due Date:05/28/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Due Date:09/20/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$92.50; Amount Paid:$92.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Due Date:09/20/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Due Date:09/20/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS , HARRY J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brough, David, ESQ.