Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:25:29 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY V MCFARLANE, LINFORD

Case Summary

On 09/25/2012 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MCFARLANE, LINFORD. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRENCH , DAVID E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRENCH , DAVID E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

MCFARLANE, LINFORD

MCFARLANE, ROCHELLE

LAGUNA MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

LAGUNA II NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

UNKNOWN TENANT #3

UNKNOWN TENANT #4

MCFARLANE , ROCHELLE

BOCA STEL 2 LLC

MCFARLANE , LINFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BERFOND ESQ, JARRET IAN

MAYLOR , SUZETTE A

CHAPKIN , JENNIFER

GREEN ESQ, KERRY ANNE

SAROFSKY ESQ, MAHRA

WHITMORE , TEPHANIE D

WHITE , ZAKKIYYAH T

CASTILLO ESQ, TARA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

STOLOFF , SCOTT A

APPLETON , ERIC N

BECHER , BRIAN M

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 29016 PAGE 1759-1761

04/11/2017:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 29016 PAGE 1759-1761

NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

12/06/2016:NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/21/2016:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:

03/10/2016:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:

STATUS REPORT

12/29/2015:STATUS REPORT

RETURNED MAIL

09/15/2015:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

08/18/2015:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

08/18/2015:RETURNED MAIL

ORDER

06/19/2015:ORDER

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

05/06/2015:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

ORDER

11/25/2014:ORDER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/15/2014:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER

07/24/2014:ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/11/2013:NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT

05/28/2013:AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

05/28/2013:AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

05/28/2013:AFFIDAVIT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/09/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

162 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • CHECK ISSUED; Notes:Deposit & Bonds(Led_ID: 570255 Case#: PER F.S. 116.21) Check #: 00005750 for $100 was disbursed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT - PER F.S. 116.21; Notes:Per F.S. 116.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:2359992 $100.00 SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 29016 PAGE 1759-1761; Notes:AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS DTD. 4/11/17 D FRENCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDUCE F\B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE; Notes:ORDER RE-SETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RESETTING; Notes:CASE IS RESET FOR TRIAL BEGINNING ON 4/13/17 AT 9:00 AM DTD. 2/17/17 D FRENCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING TIME CERTAIN FOR NON JURY TRIAL AND SETTING FORTH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES FIELD BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Notes:OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING TIME CERTAIN FOR NON JURY TRIAL AND SETTING FORTH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES FIELD BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; Notes:AND SETTING FORTH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. NON-JURY TRIAL 4/21/17 AT 9:00AM ROOM 10E M COLIN DTD 12/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL; Notes:F/B PLT (UP 12/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
181 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB714704; Receipt Amount: $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB714704; Receipt Amount: $1,966.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$2,199.10; total Amount Paid:$2,199.10; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Due Date:10/03/2017; Description:Civil Bond Disbursement; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Due Date:10/21/2015; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Due Date:02/27/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Due Date:02/18/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$67.50; Amount Paid:$67.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOCA STEL 2 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Laguna Springs Ho Assn Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECHER , BRIAN M