This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/05/2023 at 22:46:09 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2006-NC2 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-NC2 V PEREZ, FELIX

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2006-NC2 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-NC2 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PEREZ, FELIX. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2006-NC2 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-NC2

Defendants and Respondents

PALM BEACH COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

PEREZ , FELIX

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FELIX PEREZ AKA FELIX A PEREZ

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENBERG , ANNA J

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BROWN , TONI-ANN S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/24/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/24/2023:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

02/24/2023:LIS PENDENS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/24/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST

02/24/2023:REQUEST

PAID $965.60 ON RECEIPT 4791380

02/24/2023:PAID $965.60 ON RECEIPT 4791380

ANSWER

03/28/2023:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

03/30/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/30/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

03/30/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/31/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/31/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PALM BEACH COUNTY, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA - 03/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE FELIX PEREZ A/K/A FELIX A PEREZ - 03/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1 SERVED AS KYLE SMITH - 03/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FELIX PEREZ A/K/A FELIX A PEREZ, RE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE FILED BY PALM BEACH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4791380; Receipt Amount: $965.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $965.60; total Amount Paid: $965.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@exllegal.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO PALM BEACH COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@exllegal.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@exllegal.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@exllegal.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FELIX PEREZ AKA FELIX A PEREZ EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efiling@exllegal.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO FELIX PEREZ AKA FELIX A PEREZ EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34143 PAGE 1032-1032; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less