This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/25/2023 at 19:49:48 (UTC).

DEPAOLA, ALFRED JR V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 DEPAOLA, ALFRED JR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL , CAROLYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL , CAROLYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DEPAOLA JR, ALFRED

Defendant and Respondent

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KESSLER , JOSEPH R

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

RAPHAEL , VALERIE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/23/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/23/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/23/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/23/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/23/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/23/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/23/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4790360

02/24/2023:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4790360

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/28/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/13/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/13/2023:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/14/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/14/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/14/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (THE "INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; F/B VALARIE RAPHAEL ESQ., AS ATTY OF RECORD FOR DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 02/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4790360; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4790360; Notes: $411.00 4790360 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: DUCES TECUM FIELD ADJUSTER DATE AND TIME TBD F/B ATTY KESSLER OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: DUCES TECUM CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE DATE AND TIME TBD F/B ATTY KESSLER OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY KESSLER OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jkessler@dklawfl.com;mtellez@dklawfl.com;eservice@dklawfl.com ISSUED TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less