This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/21/2019 at 15:05:05 (UTC).

DENISON SOUTH LLC V DUNLAP, COREY M

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 DENISON SOUTH LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DUNLAP, COREY M. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DENISON SOUTH LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DUNLAP , COREY M

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 KNOWN AS BRITTANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROY , DAVE K

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/18/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/18/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/18/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/28/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/23/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/23/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/23/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/23/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $225.00 ON RECEIPT 3373525

10/18/2019:PAID $225.00 ON RECEIPT 3373525

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/17/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT COREY M. DUNLAP, CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:AS TO DFT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2. FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:AS TO DFT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 KNOWN ONLY AS BRITTANY . FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED COREY M DUNLAP - 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:BY POSTED ON 10.22.19 TO DFT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:BY POSTED ON 10.22.19 TO DFT UNKOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 KNOWN ONLY AS BRITTANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $225.00 ON RECEIPT 3373525; Notes:$225.00 3373525 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:info@daveroylaw.com 5 DAY DFT UNKNOWN 1 E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:info@daveroylaw.com 20 DAY DFT COREY E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Receipt Number:3373525; Receipt Amount: $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$225.00; total Amount Paid:$225.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Due Date:10/18/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Due Date:10/18/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Due Date:10/18/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Due Date:10/18/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Due Date:10/18/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less