This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/02/2022 at 09:12:46 (UTC).

DEL CID PEREZ, LUIS V SCOTT, JONATHAN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 DEL CID PEREZ, LUIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCOTT, JONATHAN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DEL CID PEREZ , LUIS

Defendants and Respondents

SCOTT , JONATHAN

SPECTRUM RENOVATIONS AC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BATISTA-CAGAN , STEFANO

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PETERFRIEND , WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

09/29/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/27/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/27/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/27/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

09/16/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/16/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/16/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4604068

09/07/2022:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4604068

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

09/06/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4574655

08/15/2022:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4574655

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/12/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/12/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/12/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/12/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/12/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes: DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: DEFENDANT S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: DEFENDANT S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: ADDRESSES F/B ATTY WILLIAM J PETERFRIEND OBO DFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B ATTY WILLIAM J PETERFRIEND OBO DFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SPECTRUM RENOVATIONS AC (SER 9/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4604068; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4574655; Notes: $401.00 4574655 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT SPECTRUM RENOVATIONS AC LLC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT SPECTURM RENOVATIONS AC LLC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: TO DFT JONATHAN SCOTT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEFANO BATISTA-CAGAN