This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 19:02:57 (UTC).

DAVIS, BRAD V MICHALAROS, JASON A

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 DAVIS, BRAD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MICHALAROS, JASON A. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DAVIS , BRAD

Defendants and Respondents

MICHALAROS , JASON A

SINGARES , DAPHNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/07/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

03/01/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34149 PAGE 118-118

02/27/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34149 PAGE 118-118

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/27/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/16/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/16/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

02/15/2023:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/13/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/13/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/13/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/13/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/13/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/13/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/08/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/08/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4763227

02/01/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4763227

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: TO JASON A MICHALAROS, DAPHNE SINGARES, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION, WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED ON 3/3/2023 EXECUTED ON 3/7/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FWD TO PBSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34149 PAGE 118-118; Notes: AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION -JUDGE SILVER 2/27/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM TO JASON A MICHALAROS AND DAPHNE SINGARES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: AGAINST JASON A MICHALAROS AND DAPHNE SINGARES F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM TO JASON A MICHALAROS AND DAPHNE SINGARES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE JASON A. MICHALAROS - 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DAPHNE SINGARES - 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/01/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/01/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/01/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4763227; Notes: $205.00 4763227 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: UNLAWFUL DETAINER-E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less